STOKE NEWINGTON COMMUNITY EXCHANGE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The charity has received a grant from Safer London Foundation to run a victim support project. Fund has been raised by climbing the Kilimanjaro in Kenya, doing the marathon and cycle rally.The charity received a grant from Awards for All for adult lessons. Pete Brennan Trust Fund donates money to free school meals students for uniforms and support them to take part in school trips.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2015
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Llywodraethu
- 05 Rhagfyr 2007: Cofrestrwyd
- 04 Ionawr 2017: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- FRIENDS OF STOKE NEWINGTON SCHOOL (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £43.86k | £580 | £1.45k | £0 | £30 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £49.67k | £562 | £144 | £216 | £144 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 28 Ionawr 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 24 Gorffennaf 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2014 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 24 Gorffennaf 2014 | 174 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2013 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/11/2007 AS AMENDED ON 06/12/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS THEIR FAMILIES AND THE COMMUNITY WITHIN STOKE NEWINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STOKE NEWINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Maes buddion
STOKE NEWINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window