Dogfen lywodraethu THE OXFORD MINDFULNESS FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/01/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 JUN 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND THE MENTAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION): (A) PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO (1) PREVENTING DEPRESSION AND ENHANCING HUMAN POTENTIAL ACROSS THE LIFESPAN AND (2) REDUCING SUFFERING, PROMOTING RESILIENCE AND THE REALISATION OF HUMAN POTENTIAL ACROSS THE LIFESPAN THROUGH MINDFULNESS; AND/OR (B) TRAINING MENTAL HEALTH PRACTITIONERS AND OTHER PROFESSIONALS IN MINDFULNESS PRACTICE WITH A VIEW TO THEM APPLYING IT IN THEIR OWN PROFESSIONAL LIVES SO AS TO ACHIEVE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: • TEACHING IT TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AND/ OR • ENHANCING EFFECTIVE ETHICAL MEDICAL PRACTICE IN THE MANAGEMENT OF THEIR ORGANISATIONS; AND/OR • PROVIDING THERAPY FOR USERS OF MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES; AND/OR (C) HOLDING AND ADMINISTERING FUNDS FOR PERMANENT AND TEMPORARY TEACHING POSTS IN MINDFULNESS STUDIES AT OXFORD UNIVERSITY; AND/OR (D) THE ADMINISTRATION OF TEACHING AND RESEARCH ACTIVITIES IN MINDFULNESS STUDIES UNDERTAKEN AT OXFORD UNIVERSITY; AND/OR (E) AGREEING ARRANGEMENTS FOR COLLABORATION IN RESPECT OF MINDFULNESS STUDIES TEACHING AND RESEARCH WITH OXFORD UNIVERSITY (AND COLLEGES, FACULTIES AND DEPARTMENTS WITHIN IT) AND WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS INVOLVED WITH SUCH WORK; AND/OR (F) TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THESE OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
OXFORD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.