Dogfen lywodraethu THE NAKED HEART FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JUNE 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 SEPTEMBER 2008 NULL AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 FEB 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 DEC 2010 as amended on 22 Feb 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity’s objects are, for the public benefit, to advance such charitable purposes (according to the law of England and Wales) as the trustees see fit from time to time and in particular but not limited to: (a) the relief of persons who are in need, hardship or distress and, in particular (without prejudice to the generality) persons with special educational needs and disabilities and their families, and to advance the welfare of said persons by supporting (either directly or by the provision of grants to organisations) the running of parent/carer training programmes, awareness raising events and knowledge exchange programmes; and (b) the provision of facilities for recreation and other leisure-time activities provided in the interest of social welfare with the object of improving the conditions of life for the persons for whom they are intended and to advance inclusion in society for people of all physical, mental and sensory abilities.
Maes buddion
OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.