GROUNDWORK LONDON

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To promote the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment;to provide facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation and lesiure time occupation ; advance public education in environmental matters and to help people conserve, protect and improve their environment.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Cyfanswm incwm:
£32,416,121
Roddion a chymynroddion | £0 | |
Weithgareddau elusennol | £32.02m | |
Weithgareddau masnachu eraill | £0 | |
Buddsoddiadau | £398.99k | |
Arall | £0 |
Cyfanswm gwariant:
£32,351,866
Codi arian | £94.12k | |
Weithgareddau elusennol | £32.26m | |
Arall | £0 |
£132,691 enillion (colledion) buddsoddiadau
Mae cyfanswm yr incwm yn cynnwys £16,459,123 o 149 gontract(au) llywodraeth a £2,671,865 o 67 grant(iau) llywodraeth
Gwariant elusennol
Gwariant elusennol gydag enillion buddsoddi
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Codi arian a Arall Gwariant | £94.12k | |
Gwariant elusennol | £32.26m | |
Cadwyd i'w ddefnyddio yn y dyfodol | £64.26k |
Codi arian a Arall Gwariant | £94.12k | |
Gwariant elusennol | £32.26m | |
Cadwyd i'w ddefnyddio yn y dyfodol | £196.95k |
Pobl

492 Gweithwyr
7 Ymddiriedolwyr
16786 Gwirfoddolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Nifer y cyflogeion | |
---|---|
£60k i £70k | 1 |
£70k i £80k | 1 |
£80k i £90k | 2 |
£90k i £100k | 1 |
Roedd un neu fwy o'r cyflogeion yn ymddiriedolwyr yn flaenorol
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Llundain Fwyaf
Llywodraethu
- 09 Hydref 2007: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
- Ofsted (Swyddfa Safonau Mewn Addysg)
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau bwlio ac aflonyddu
- Trin cwynion
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheoli risg mewnol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau buddsoddi cronfeydd elusen
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau adrodd am ddigwyddiadau difrifol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
7 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN SMITH | Cadeirydd | 13 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Wen-Yu Weng | Ymddiriedolwr | 26 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Tony Beaman | Ymddiriedolwr | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA BEER | Ymddiriedolwr | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Alan Leake | Ymddiriedolwr | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Taylor | Ymddiriedolwr | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM BEAL | Ymddiriedolwr | 10 March 2014 |
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £24.79m | £20.96m | £28.17m | £33.16m | £32.42m | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £24.23m | £20.87m | £27.78m | £32.92m | £32.35m | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £12.19m | £9.49m | £16.05m | £21.31m | £16.46m | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £3.42m | £3.34m | £3.28m | £4.07m | £2.67m | |
|
Incwm o roddion a chymynroddion | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o weithgareddau masnachu eraill | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm - Weithgareddau elusennol | £24.38m | £20.61m | £27.75m | £32.74m | £32.02m | |
|
Incwm - Gwaddolion | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm - Buddsoddiad | £403.85k | £348.20k | £425.12k | £418.87k | £398.99k | |
|
Incwm - Arall | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm - Cymynroddion | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Gwariant - Ggweithgareddau elusennol | £23.92m | £20.62m | £27.48m | £32.80m | £32.26m | |
|
Gwariant - Ar godi arian | £308.52k | £246.57k | £290.66k | £122.10k | £94.12k | |
|
Gwariant - Llywodraethu | £73.45k | £66.28k | £58.96k | £60.53k | £62.74k | |
|
Gwariant - Sefydliad grantiau | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Gwariant - Rheoli buddsoddiadau | £308.52k | £246.57k | £290.66k | £122.10k | £94.12k | |
|
Gwariant - Arall | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Asedau a rhwymedigaethau
Diffiniadau ar gyfer asedau a rhwymedigaethau
Asedau yw’r rhain, ac nid buddsoddiadau, a ddelir am fwy na 12 mis ac a ddefnyddir i redeg a gweinyddu’r elusen megis adeiladau, swyddfeydd, arddangosfeydd a gosodiadau a ffitiadau.
Buddsoddiadau Tymor HirBuddsoddiadau yw asedau a ddelir gan yr elusen gyda’r unig nod o gynhyrchu incwm a ddefnyddir ar gyfer eu dibenion elusennol megis cyfrifon cadw, rhanddaliadau, eiddo a rentir ac ymddiriedolaethau unedau.
Ailbrisir asedau buddsoddi bob blwyddyn ac fe’u cynhwysir yn y fantolen ar eu gwerth marchnad cyfredol.
Delir buddsoddiadau tymor hir am fwy na 12 mis.
Asedau yw’r rhain a ddelir yn gyffredinol am lai na 12 mis megis arian parod a balansau banc, dyledwyr, buddsoddiadau i'w gwerthu o fewn y flwyddyn sydd i ddod a stoc masnachu.
Ased neu rwymedigaeth cynllun pensiwn budd a ddiffiniwydArian dros ben neu ddiffyg yw hwn mewn unrhyw gynllun pensiwn budd a ddiffinnir sy’n cael ei weithredu ac mae’n cynrychioli ased neu rwymedigaeth tymor hir botensial.
Cyfanswm rhwymedigaethauDyma’r holl symiau sy’n ddyledus gan yr elusen ar ddyddiad y daflen balans i drydydd partïon megis biliau sy’n ddyledus ond heb eu talu hyd yn hyn, gorddrafftiau banc a benthyciadau a morgeisi.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Asedau hunan ddefnydd | £2.41m | £2.38m | £2.28m | £2.22m | £5.34m | |
|
Buddsoddiadau tymor hir | £2.77m | £3.56m | £3.54m | £3.52m | £350.30k | |
|
Cyfanswm asedau | £12.94m | £13.58m | £15.33m | £15.60m | £15.65m | |
|
Ased neu rwymedigaeth cynllun pensiwn budd a ddiffiniwyd | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm rhwymedigaethau | £8.17m | £8.35m | £9.30m | £9.52m | £9.33m |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 22 Tachwedd 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 22 Tachwedd 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 13 Rhagfyr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 13 Rhagfyr 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 16 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 16 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 20 Rhagfyr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 20 Rhagfyr 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 28 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 28 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/05/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
2.1) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN LONDON (THE AREA). 2.2) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE LIVING IN OR WORKING IN OR RESORTING TO THE AREA. 2.3) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS AND OF THE WAYS OF BETTER CONSERVING, PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE SAME WHERESOEVER. 2.4) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION WITHIN THE AREA BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 2.4.1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT; 2.4.2) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; 2.4.3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RE-TRAINING PARTICULARLY AMONGST UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 2.4.4) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE, BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESSES; OR II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; 2.4.5) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORK SPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 2.4.6) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND TH IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING; 2.4.7) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF ROUTEWAYS SUCH AS FOOTPATHS AND CYCLEWAYS AND ACCESS TO MAIN TRANSPORT ROUTES; 2.4.8) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; 2.4.9) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR THOSE WHO BE REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; 2.4.10) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, INCLUDING THE RECLAMATION OF DERELICT LAND FOR USE AS OPEN SPACE; 2.4.11) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF SCHEMES TO PROMOTE HEALTHIER LIFESTYLES AND CRECHE FACILITIES TO INCREASE THE ABILITY OF PARENTS TO TAKE UP EMPLOYMENT; 2.4.12) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME, INCLUDING THE ALLEVIATION OF ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR; 2.4.13) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. 2.5) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN THE AREA BY: A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. 2.6) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN THIS ARTICLE AND IN ARTICLE 3.5 ABOVE MEANS "DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS". 2.7) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES IN THE DIRECT FURTHERANCE OF THEIR OBJECTS (OR ANY ONE OF THEM) BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN THE ESTABLISHMENT, ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH CHARITIES INCLUDING ASSISTANCE OF ALL TYPES IN CONNECTION WITH THE RAISING AND DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS. 2.8 TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO LOCAL COMMUNITY BASED GROUPS ANYWHERE IN THE AREA.
Maes buddion
GREATER LONDON
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
GROUNDWORK
18-21 MORLEY STREET
LONDON
SE1 7QZ
- Ffôn:
- 02079221230
- E-bost:
- london@groundwork.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window