INTERNATIONAL ISLAMIC RELIEF ORGANISATION (UK)
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
IIROUK is primarily concerned with the provision of humanitarian aid for the benefit of those in need, especially orphans and widows, including the provision of the basic necessities of life, education and training. The trustees are currently involved in establishing and staffing their London office and designing the IIROUK website. Our initial projects will be UK based, insh'Allah.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2021
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- IIROUK (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £18.92k | £157.96k | £70.03k | £1.22k | £928 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £43.25k | £62.26k | £130.43k | £9.82k | £772 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 05 Tachwedd 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 10 Tachwedd 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 22 Mehefin 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 22 Mehefin 2019 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/08/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/08/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM (THE UK) AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO: 1. RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR ORPHANS, WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED OR WHOSE LIVES HAVE BEEN IMPACTED OR AFFECTED BY POVERTY, ILLNESS OR CIVIL CONFLICT; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE FAITH AND RELIGIOUS PRACTICES OF ISLAM FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 4. THE RELIEF OF NEED AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT; 5. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 6. THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE BOARD MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window