JUBILEE FAMILY CENTRE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Based in Aylsham, Norfolk, the Jubilee Family Centre cares, supports & provides activities for families, couples, singles & groups. At the heart of the Centre's identity is the need to create and support a vibrant and healthy community life for Aylsham & its surrounding villages. We want everyone to know that they are valued, cared for and included.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 June 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Norfolk
Llywodraethu
- 11 Medi 2024: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1105216 AYLSHAM COMMUNITY CHURCH
- 23 Ionawr 2008: Cofrestrwyd
- 11 Medi 2024: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £29.48k | £26.29k | £29.80k | £13.60k | £3.66k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £30.98k | £31.74k | £32.90k | £27.25k | £25.11k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2024 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2024 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2022 | 26 Chwefror 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 26 Gorffennaf 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 14 Awst 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 14 Awst 2020 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 SEPTEMBER 2007, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 JANUARY 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF AYLSHAM, NORFOLK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3.2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY EDUCATING AND TRAINING IN BASIC SKILLS, MARRIAGE AND PARENTING SKILLS, PERSONAL FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT AND THE PROVISION OF AFTER SCHOOL AND HOLIDAY CLUBS. 3.3) TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window