GRAHAMSTOWN UNITED SCHOOLS TRUST

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To provide bursaries to academically outstanding pupils or those pupils deserving and in need of financial assistance; To assist with the provision of, the maintenance of, the repair of, the upgrading of, or the improvement of classrooms, educational, sporting and other facilities and equipment; For such other purposes as the trustees may in their discretion consider beneficial
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2023
Pobl

4 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- De Affrica
Llywodraethu
- 29 Ionawr 2008: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
4 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW JOHN ESSEX LA TROBE | Cadeirydd |
|
||||||||||
Russell Clough | Ymddiriedolwr | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
BRIAN VINCENT WAKEHAM | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
||||||||||
GRAHAM JOHN BIRD | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £14.07k | £15.41k | £22.38k | £20.95k | £61.56k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £68.89k | £29.26k | £22.38k | £0 | £21.28k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 12 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 12 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 27 Gorffennaf 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 28 Hydref 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 09 Tachwedd 2021 | 9 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 14 Hydref 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 NOVEMBER 2007
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AN ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS"), AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT; 3.1.1 TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING GRAHAMSTOWN SCHOOLS:- A) ST ANDREWS PREPARATORY SCHOOL; B) THE DIOCESAN SCHOOL FOR GIRLS; C) ST ANDREWS COLLEGE (TOGETHER THE "GRAHAMSTOWN SCHOOLS") 3.1.2 TO PROVIDE BURSARIES TO ACADEMICALLY OUTSTANDING PUPILS OR THOSE PUPILS DESERVING AND IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE, TO ASSIST THEM OR ENABLE THEM TO ATTEND ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE GRAHAMSTOWN SCHOOLS; 3.2.3 TO ASSIST WITH THE PROVISION OF, THE MAINTENANCE OF, THE REPAIR OF, THE UPGRADING OF, OR THE IMPROVEMENT OF CLASSROOMS, EDUCATIONAL, SPORTING AND OTHER FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE GRAHAMSTOWN SCHOOLS AND/OR THEIR PUPILS; 3.1.4 FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION CONSIDER BENEFICIAL TO ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE GRAHAMSTOWN SCHOOLS OR ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING THE GRAHAMSTOWN SCHOOLS. 3.2 THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION, FOR THE PERIOD OF 21 YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED, INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR, ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME BY INVESTING THE SAME, AND THE RESULTING INCOME, IN ANY INVESTMENTS AUTHORISED BY THIS DEED OR BY LAW AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Maes buddion
AFRICA
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
20 Naylor Road
Whetstone
N20 0HN
- Ffôn:
- 07767873015
- E-bost:
- bvw20nlr@aol.com
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window