BISHOP NYMPTON COMMUNITY LAND TRUST LIMITED
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Provision of Affordable Housing for local people
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 August 2010
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Llety/tai
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Dyfnaint
Llywodraethu
- 11 Ionawr 2008: Cofrestrwyd
- 03 Awst 2011: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £3.96k | £270 | £705 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £3.65k | £250 | £451 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2010 | 27 Rhagfyr 2010 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2010 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2009 | 21 Mawrth 2010 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2009 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2008 | 08 Mawrth 2009 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2008 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 SEPTEMBER 2007.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) PROVIDING HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; 2) PROVIDING FOR THE AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 3) PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF; 4) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 5) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 6) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 7) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING THE CONSERVATION, RESTORATION AND RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF TREES IN PARTICULAR BROAD LEAFED TREES PLANTS AND ALL FORMS OF WILDLIFE AND THEREBY TO SECURE THE ENJOYMENT BY THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; 8) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILD CARE; 9) THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTNERSHIP WITH THE POLICE AND OTHER BODIES AND AGENCIES, OF THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY FROM AND THE PREVENTION OF CRIMINAL ACTS, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH ASSISTING IN MEASURES DESIGNED TO REDUCE THE LEVEL OF CRIME, ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR, DRUG AND ALCOHOL DEPENDENCY AND VEHICLE SPEEDING AND TO PROVIDE EDUCATION INFORMATION AND PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE IN COMMUNITY SAFETY TO THE COMMUNITY. HOUSES AND HOSTELS SHALL HAVE THE MEANINGS GIVEN BY SECTION 106 OF THE HOUSING ASSOCIATIONS ACT 1985 AND SHALL INCLUDE BLOCKS OF FLATS WITHIN THE MEANING OF SECTION 4 OF THE HOUSING ASSOCIATIONS ACT 1985.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE DEVON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window