Dogfen lywodraethu ZIMKIDS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 FEB 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 OCT 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 JAN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 DEC 2017 as amended on 16 Apr 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. RELIEVING POVERTY: TO PROVIDE EMERGENCY SUPPORT, FOOD, CLOTHING, SHELTER AND MEDICAL HELP, FOR CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND FAMILIES IN TIMES OF CRISIS. 2. PROMOTING SELF-SUFFICIENCY: TO GIVE ADVICE AND TRAINING IN VARIOUS METHODS OF SELF-SUFFICIENCY TO ENSURE A MORE POSITIVE FUTURE FOR VULNERABLE INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES. 3. ENHANCING LIFE: TO IMPROVE THE LIFE-CHANCES OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS IN NEED BY GIVING EMOTIONAL AND EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT, TEACHING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, AND PROVIDING RESOURCES TO ASSIST PARTICIPATION IN SCHOOLING AND FURTHER EDUCATION.
Maes buddion
ZIMBABWE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.