FIRTASH FOUNDATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
During the year Firtash Foundation remained committed to supporting its charitable objectives, one of which is advancement of Ukrainian arts, culture, heritage or science. Building on the success of previous Days of Ukraine in the UK festivals, Firtash Foundation continued to organise a series of exhibitions and competitions to support and showcase the works of young talents.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 05 April 2017
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Llundain Fwyaf
- Ukrain
Llywodraethu
- 02 Mehefin 2008: Cofrestrwyd
- 25 Mai 2023: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- DF FOUNDATION (Enw blaenorol)
- Rheoli risg
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £70.65k | £1.48m | £89 | £230.06k | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £42.55k | £1.48m | £181.32k | £67.90k | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o roddion a chymynroddion | N/A | £1.48m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o weithgareddau masnachu eraill | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Weithgareddau elusennol | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Gwaddolion | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Buddsoddiad | N/A | £15 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Arall | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Cymynroddion | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ggweithgareddau elusennol | N/A | £1.48m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ar godi arian | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Llywodraethu | N/A | £9.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Sefydliad grantiau | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Rheoli buddsoddiadau | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Arall | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/02/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/07/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITING OR RESTRICTING THE GENERALITY THEREOF):- 1) THE ESTABLISHMENT AND FUNDING OF A CHAIR IN UKRANIAN STUDIES AT ANY UNIVERSITY OR UNIVERSITIES AND THE FUNDING OF RESEARCH AND TEACHING OF UKRANIAN STUDIES IN ORDER TO BROADEN UNDERSTANDING OF THE HISTORY, LANGUAGE, CULTURE AND PEOPLE OF THE REPUBLIC OF UKRANE, 2) THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIP, BURSARIES PRIZES, GRANTS AND ALLOWANCES TO STUDENT OR PROSPECTIVE STUDENTS OF UKRANIAN STUDIES AT ANY UNIVERSITY OR COLLEGE OR EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM; B) THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE COMPANY ("THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE REPUBLIC OF UKRAINE.
Maes buddion
THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window