REACHOUT BULGARIA
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Improving the care of children in orphanages by providing clothing, equipment and care. The charity regularly takes specialist therapist teams to work with special needs children and to teach staff basic care and management of these children. Furthermore, the charity co-ordinates work parties to enhance and improve the living conditions in orphanages, for example installing bathrooms and toilets
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2018
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Bwlgaria
Llywodraethu
- 17 Mehefin 2008: Cofrestrwyd
- 16 Tachwedd 2020: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £16.26k | £12.70k | £5.10k | £39.27k | £16.84k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £16.72k | £12.23k | £5.87k | £38.10k | £20.27k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | 31 Hydref 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | 30 Hydref 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | 30 Hydref 2018 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2016 | 30 Hydref 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2016 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 1 MARY 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND OTHER SUPPLIES FOR HOSPITALS IN BULGARIA. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF ORPHANS IN BULGARIA BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHES, SCHOOL AND SPORTS EQUIPMENT AND ASSISTING IN THE REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF ORPHANAGES.
Maes buddion
BULGARIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window