Dogfen lywodraethu KIDS IN MUSEUMS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/02/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 JUL 2016 as amended on 08 Aug 2018 as amended on 08 Aug 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, INCLUDING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS AND SCIENCES IN MUSEUMS, GALLERIES, SCHOOLS AND OTHER PLACES OF FORMAL AND INFORMAL LEARNING
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.