Dogfen lywodraethu FAMILIES IN TELFORD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 28/08/2013 as amended on 17 Nov 2020 as amended on 17 Nov 2020 as amended on 06 Nov 2019 as amended on 22 Nov 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 TO PROVIDE AN APPROPRIATE MEETING PLACE FOR PARENTS AND CARERS AND THEIR PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, GENDER, SEXUALITY, PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ABILITIES, WHERE MEMBERS CAN SEEK ADVICE AND SUPPORT 2 TO ADVANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AGED 0-5, THEIR FAMILIES, PARENTS AND CARERS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY * THE PROVISION OF A SAFE, SECURE AND STIMULATING ENVIRONMENT * THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND RECREATIONAL LEARNING ACTIVITIES * THE PROVISION OF HELP AND FAMILY SUPPORT 3 TO GIVE PARENTS AND CARERS THE RIGHT TO PARTICIPATE IN AND TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE ACTIVITIES AND ORGANISATION OF THE PROJECT 4 TO DO ALL SUCH THINGS AS SHALL BE CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.