THE BANCYFELIN EDUCATION COMMUNITY TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
OBJECTS / ACTIVITIES - TO PROMOTE RURAL REGENERATION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT IN BANCYFELIN BY ALL MEANS POSSIBLE - TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF COMMUNITY MEMBERS IN BANCYFELIN - TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT BANCYFELIN SCHOOL THE ACTIVITIES OF THE TRUSTEES COVER THE IDENTIFICATION AND CONSIDERATION OF PROJECTS WHICH REALISE THE ABOVE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 15 February 2019
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Sir Gaerfyrddin
Llywodraethu
- 17 Mehefin 2009: Cofrestrwyd
- 09 Mawrth 2020: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Rheoli risg
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 15/02/2015 | 15/02/2016 | 15/02/2017 | 15/02/2018 | 15/02/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £2.01k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £2.01k | £0 | £0 | £50 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 15 Chwefror 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 15 Chwefror 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 15 Chwefror 2019 | 09 Tachwedd 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 15 Chwefror 2019 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 15 Chwefror 2018 | 26 Hydref 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 15 Chwefror 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 15 Chwefror 2017 | 29 Awst 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 15 Chwefror 2017 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/05/2009 AS AMENDED ON 10/05/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR BANCYFELIN VILLAGE AND (AND WITHIN 5 MILES OF THE VILLAGE) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY: B. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE: C. THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES: D. THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE: E. THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES: F. THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION, DEVELOPMENT OR ENHANCEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT: G. THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE: H. THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME: I. SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. 2. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF BANCYFELIN VILLAGE AND LAND WITHIN 5 MILES OF THE VILLAGE IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Maes buddion
BANCYFELIN VILLAGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window