THE TONY BLAIR GOVERNANCE INITIATIVE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
AGI?s mission is to make government work for the world?s poorest people. We do this by supporting effective governance: working with African leaders to build the capacity of their governments to implement the programmes and reforms they need to develop their countries, reduce poverty and improve standards of living.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 28 February 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Ethiopia
- Guinée
- Liberia
- Nigeria
- Rwanda
- Sierra Leone
Llywodraethu
- 03 Tachwedd 2009: Cofrestrwyd
- 21 Awst 2023: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- TONY BLAIR AFRICA GOVERNANCE INITIATIVE (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £1.90m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £1.93m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o roddion a chymynroddion | £1.89m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o weithgareddau masnachu eraill | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Weithgareddau elusennol | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Gwaddolion | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Buddsoddiad | £8.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Arall | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Cymynroddion | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ggweithgareddau elusennol | £1.93m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ar godi arian | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Llywodraethu | £102.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Sefydliad grantiau | £1.73m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Rheoli buddsoddiadau | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Arall | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 28 Chwefror 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 28 Chwefror 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 28 Chwefror 2022 | 16 Mawrth 2023 | 78 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 28 Chwefror 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 28 Chwefror 2021 | 01 Gorffennaf 2022 | 185 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 28 Chwefror 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 29 Chwefror 2020 | 19 Mai 2021 | 141 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 29 Chwefror 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 4 FEBRUARY 2009, 20 FEBRUARY 2009 AND 4 NOVEMBER 2010.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EFFICIENT PUBLIC ADMINISTRATION OF GOVERNMENT AND PUBLIC SERVICES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH A VIEW TO RELIEVING POVERTY BY IMPROVING: 3.1.1) THE SKILLS AND CAPACITIES OF INDIVIDUALS WITHIN GOVERNMENT AND PUBLIC SERVICES; AND/OR 3.1.2) THE SYSTEMS AND PROCESSES OF GOVERNMENT AND PUBLIC SERVICES. 3.2) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT WITH A VIEW TO RELIEVING POVERTY BY: 3.2.1) THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN COMMUNITIES FACING POVERTY AND/OR SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE; AND/OR 3.2.2) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. 3.3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT GOOD GOVERNANCE AND SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT. IN THESE OBJECTS, "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window