LINCOLNSHIRE ASSOCIATION OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILTIES
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Delvering training on Disability Awareness and the Disability Discrimination Act. Access Auditing to provide recommendations for improvements in line with the DDA and Part M of the Buildings Regulations. Disability awareness in schools presentations, by disabled members Supporting disabled volunteers Representation on roups. Support and advice on disability issues.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2011
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Anabledd
- Hawliau Dynol/cytgord Crefyddol Neu Hiliol/cydraddoldeb Neu Amrywiaeth
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Swydd Lincoln
Llywodraethu
- 15 Medi 2009: Cofrestrwyd
- 21 Ionawr 2015: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £61.58k | £3.81k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £62.06k | £39.13k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 01 Ebrill 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 01 Ebrill 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 01 Ebrill 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 01 Ebrill 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 01 Ebrill 2012 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 01 Ebrill 2012 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2011 | 23 Ionawr 2012 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2011 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 NOVEMBER 2009.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED PEOPLE IN LINCOLNSHIRE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN DISABILITY. THIS WILL BE ACHIEVED IN PARTICULAR BY: 3.1.1 ENCOURAGING DISABLED PEOPLE TO BE ACTIVELY INVOLVED IN EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DISABILITY; 3.1.2 PROVIDING TRAINING IN DISABILITY AWARENESS AND EQUALITY; 3.1.3 EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN ISSUES RELATING TO DISABILITY AND IN PARTICULAR, EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN WAYS IN WHICH DISCRIMINATION CAN BE ELIMINATED. 3.2 TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND REHABILITATION OF DISABLED PEOPLE. THIS WILL BE ACHIEVED IN PARTICULAR BY: 3.2.1 PROVIDING TRAINING TO DISABLED PEOPLE; 3.2.2 MEETING THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT NEEDS OF INDIVIDUAL DISABLED PEOPLE INCLUDING NEEDS FOR WORK AND RECREATION; 3.2.3 PROMOTING AND ASSISTING THE INCLUSION OF DISABLED PEOPLE IN THE COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window