SUBLIME LIFE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The operation of a bus for youth work, with gaming equipment, computers, sound recording studio and more. Detached and centre based work building the capacity, providing education, training and care to young people, children and adults.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 July 2017
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Essex
- Llundain Fwyaf
Llywodraethu
- 21 Awst 2009: Cofrestrwyd
- 28 Medi 2019: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
- HOPE FOR ENFIELD YOUTH (Enw blaenorol)
- Buddiannau croes
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £104.96k | £80.69k | £93.54k | £42.68k | £15.22k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £109.44k | £89.80k | £95.01k | £48.77k | £14.39k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2017 | 18 Mawrth 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2017 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2016 | 25 Medi 2017 | 117 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR |
31 Gorffennaf 2016
(Mae'r cyfrifon |
25 Medi 2017 | 117 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/02/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY IN ENFIELD AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD A THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE TRUSTEES') MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY B TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AMONGST PEOPLE OF ALL AGES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN ENFIELD AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FITT
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window