Dogfen lywodraethu SOLUTIONS FOR COMMUNITIES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/08/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/05/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/03/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
= TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC = TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE WITHIN THE AFRICAN COMMUNITY IN THE UK IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND A SIGNPOSTING SERVICE = THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG WIDOWS AND ORPHANS OF HIV/AIDS AND OTHER CHILDREN WHO HAVE LOST THEIR MOTHERS THROUGH CHILDBIRTH AND ILLNESS IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS ESPECIALLY UGANDA AND KENYA
Maes buddion
THE UK AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.