PETERBOROUGH AFRICAN COMMUNITY ORGANISATION - PACO
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Peterborough African Community Organisation has been the charity behind Peterborough Community Radio since 2007. The project has been used as a regeneration tool to deliver outputs of social benefit as well as bringing people together to learn from one another working toward community cohesion. PACO has years of track record in delivering innovative community based projects in the area.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2018
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Dinas Peterborough
Llywodraethu
- 05 Awst 2008: Cofrestrwyd
- 11 Ebrill 2019: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
- PACO (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £147.92k | £145.24k | £120.36k | £45.94k | £19.30k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £138.48k | £154.03k | £116.17k | £58.66k | £26.16k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 31 Ionawr 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | 28 Rhagfyr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | 28 Rhagfyr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 03 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 03 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION 25 NOV 2005
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects of the association are to: (a) promote the benefit of the inhabitants of the area of benefit without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, nationality, age, disability, race or of political, religious or other opinions, by associating together the said inhabitants and the statutory authorities, voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure-time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants; (b) establish, or secure the establishment, of a Community Centre (hereinafter called "the Centre") and to maintain and manage the same (whether alone or in co-operation with any local authority or other person or body) in furtherance of these objects; (c) promote such other charitable purposes as may from time to time be determined. The Association shall be non-party in politics and non-sectarian in religion. The area of benefit shall be ..........and the neighbourhood together defined by...........................
Maes buddion
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window