SOUTH BRADFORD VOCATIONAL CENTRE LIMITED
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Centre offers vocational education, levels 1 and 2, in areas such as Business Administration, Catering, Child Care, Salon Services and Pre Uniformed Services to students aged 11-16 The provision of ÔÇÿGo LiveÔÇÖ courses to students aged 16-19 . Go-live is a programme of learning that allows students to study for a vocational qualification via out of school training and in centre education.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 August 2014
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Dinas Bradford
Llywodraethu
- 08 Hydref 2009: Cofrestrwyd
- 03 Mai 2017: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- SBVC (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £911.15k | £647.76k | £434.96k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £851.47k | £659.73k | £482.46k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o roddion a chymynroddion | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o weithgareddau masnachu eraill | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Weithgareddau elusennol | £871.47k | £642.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Gwaddolion | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Buddsoddiad | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Arall | £39.68k | £5.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Cymynroddion | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ggweithgareddau elusennol | £839.64k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ar godi arian | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Llywodraethu | £2.50k | £5.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Sefydliad grantiau | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Rheoli buddsoddiadau | £0 | £654.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Arall | £9.34k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2014 | 05 Mai 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2014 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2013 | 02 Mehefin 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2013 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15 JULY 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO PROMOTE, ADVANCE, PROVIDE AND/OR ARRANGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, AND TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT AND LIFE SKILLS, FOR PERSONS BOTH BELOW AND ABOVE THE AGE OF 18 IN THE AREA OF THE CITY OF BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT COUNCIL AND SURROUNDING AREAS (THE BENEFIT AREA); (2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROMOTING OPPORTUNITIES FOR ENTERING EMPLOYMENT AND GAINING EMPLOYABILITY BY IMPROVING STANDARDS OF EDUCATIONAL AND VOCATIONAL PROVISION AMONGST THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFIT AREA AND BY PROMOTING THE ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT OF THE BENEFIT AREA; (3) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMPANY SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING (AS THESE TERMS ARE DEFINED IN THE PREVIOUS OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY) BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION SERVICES AND FACILITIES ON TERMS CONSISTENT WITH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Maes buddion
CITY OF BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window