Dogfen lywodraethu THE WORCESTER/BIRMINGHAM AND DROITWICH CANALS SOCIETY

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 APRIL 1969 AS AMENDED 2 MAY 1978, 7 SEPTEMBER 2010, 2 SEPTEMBER 2014 AND RESOLUTION UNDER SECTION 275 OPERATIVE FROM 3 MAY 2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE AS FOLLOWS: (A) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND RESTORATION OF THE WORCESTER & BIRMINGHAM CANAL, DROITWICH JUNCTION CANAL, DROITWICH BARGE CANAL AND ADJACENT WATERWAYS (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE WATERWAYS") FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (B) TO PROMOTE THE FULLEST USE OF THE WATERWAYS BY ALL FORMS OF WATERBORNE TRAFFIC AND FOR ALL FORMS OF WATER-RELATED, COMMERCIAL LOCAL AMENITY, TOURIST AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OFTHE PUBLIC; AND (C) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND USE OF CANALS AND WATERWAYS AND OF THE WATERWAYS IN PARTICULAR
Maes buddion
WORCESTER & BIRMINGHAM CANAL, DROITWICH JUNCTION CANAL, DROITWICH BARGE CANAL AND ADJACENT WATERWAYS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.