POTTER'S HOUSE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP CHURCH (KINGSTON UPON THAMES)
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Our Charity is a local Church in Royal London Borough of Kingston Upon Thames. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH THE PREACHING OF THE GOSPEL IN OUR LOCAL AREA. WE AIM TO REACH ALL PEOPLE THROUGH FREE MUSIC CONCERTS, DRAMAS AND OTHER FREE ACTIVITIES.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2015
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Kingston Upon Thames
Llywodraethu
- 18 Chwefror 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 09 Medi 2011: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
- 30 Medi 2011: Re-registered
- 09 Mehefin 2018: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
- THE DOOR (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £5.11k | £5.00k | £9.09k | £13.97k | £27.61k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £5.22k | £4.79k | £8.02k | £13.30k | £24.91k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2015 | 30 Hydref 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2014 | 29 Ebrill 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2014 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JANUARY 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ATTACHED IN AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY REGARDLESS OF NATIONALITY, RELIGIOUS POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINION IN THE SAID (COUNTY) AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window