Dogfen lywodraethu NEW COVENANT CHERUBIM & SERAPHIM MOVEMENT CHURCH

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/07/2013 as amended on 29 Jan 2022 as amended on 01 Feb 2025 as amended on 01 Feb 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION (MARK 16:15; MATTHEW 28: 18 -20); B) THE RELIEF OF HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND OTHER SERVICES EITHER DIRECTLY OR BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT FOR OTHER ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN SUCH RELIEF; AND C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FOR EXAMPLE, INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY, YOUTH DEVELOPMENT, MENTORING AND OTHER DISCIPLINES."
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.