NRC SUPPORT GROUP
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Running social activities for present and past clients of the Royal Free Neurological Rehabilitation Centre (and its predecessor the Marie Foster Centre) and their families and carers. Providing medical equipment and other facilities for use at the Centre. Providing financial assistance to present and past clients for the purchase of items to help with their rehabilitation or disability.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 05 April 2021
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Barnet
- Brent
- Enfield
- Haringey
- Harrow
- Swydd Hertford
Llywodraethu
- 08 Ebrill 2022: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1165672 THE ROYAL FREE CHARITY
- 04 Awst 2009: Cofrestrwyd
- 08 Ebrill 2022: Tynnwyd (TROSGLWYDDO CRONFEYDD)
- MFC SUPPORT (Enw gwaith)
- MARIE FOSTER CENTRE SUPPORT GROUP (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £7.77k | £2.60k | £33.15k | £3 | £7 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £8.53k | £3.08k | £2.44k | £3.42k | £7.41k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2021 | 03 Chwefror 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2020 | 12 Mawrth 2021 | 35 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2019 | 21 Chwefror 2020 | 16 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2019 | 23 Mehefin 2021 | 504 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 08/04/2010 AS AMENDED ON 07/11/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE (A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CLIENTS AND PAST CLIENTS OF THE NEUROLOGICAL REHABILITATION CENTRE OR THE MARIE FOSTER CENTRE, AND THE CARERS OF SUCH CLIENTS AND PAST CLIENTS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID CLIENTS, PAST CLIENTS AND CARERS. (B) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF THE CLIENTS AND PAST CLIENTS OF THE NEUROLOGICAL REHABILITATION CENTRE OR THE MARIE FOSTER CENTRE, AND THE CARERS OF SUCH CLIENTS AND PAST CLIENTS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE CLIENTS OF THE NEUROLOGICAL REHABILITATION CENTRE OR THE MARIE FOSTER CENTRE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. THE NEUROLOGICAL REHABILITATION CENTRE, KNOWN AS NRC, IS LOCATED AT EDGWARE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND OPERATED BY THE ROYAL FREE HAMPSTEAD NHS TRUST. THE MARIE FOSTER CENTRE IS A FORMER HEALTH CARE FACILITY THAT WAS OPERATED BY THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE AND LOCATED IN WOOD STREET, BARNET.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window