TRIBUTE 2 A LEGEND
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Tribute 2 a Legend is a performing arts charity committed in keeping alive the memory and legacy of the great John Lennon through their aptly named WORKING CLASS HEROES theatrical / musical academy that will benefit the disadvantage youth in Tower Hamlets irrespective of sex, race or religion able or disabled and special educational needs.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 12 May 2013
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Yr Alban
Llywodraethu
- 03 Tachwedd 2009: Cofrestrwyd
- 22 Gorffennaf 2013: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- COCKNEY PRIDE (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 12/05/2010 | 12/05/2011 | 12/05/2012 | 12/05/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £500 | £150 | £9.80k | £9.57k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £2.70k | £600 | £8.77k | £8.77k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 12 Mai 2013 | 14 Mehefin 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 12 Mai 2013 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 12 Mai 2012 | 16 Tachwedd 2012 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 12 Mai 2012 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 12 Mai 2011 | 16 Medi 2011 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 12 Mai 2011 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 12 Mai 2010 | 07 Medi 2010 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 12 Mai 2010 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 13/07/2009 AS AMENDED ON 06/10/2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY GARDEN WITH A FOCUS ON BOBBY MOORE IN THE GROUNDS OF TOM HOOD COMMUNITY SCIENCE COLLEGE AND ST MARGARET'S WITH ST COLUMBUS CHURCH. THE PROVISION OF A FOOTBALL TOURNAMENT FOR UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN OF SCHOOL AGE.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window