FIREHOUSE CREATIVE PRODUCTIONS
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We create cutting-edge new theatre inspired by real life stories. All of our projects have been created with a dedication to widening access to the creative process at its core. We are developing our charityÔÇÖs work with elderly people suffering from isolation, with young people with serious illnesses, and further in the field of conflict resolution.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 September 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 09 Mawrth 2010: Cofrestrwyd
- 07 Tachwedd 2024: Tynnwyd (DILEU AR GAIS)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £9.06k | £824 | £1.50k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £2.08k | £2.44k | £515 | £3.98k | £1.16k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2022 | 25 Mai 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2021 | 19 Mehefin 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2020 | 12 Mai 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2019 | 09 Gorffennaf 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2019 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 FEB 2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF ARTS, INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. B. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, IN PARTICULAR BY ACTIVELY INVOLVING THOSE SECTORS OF THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE UNDERSERVED BY THE ARTS TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONALLY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window