Dogfen lywodraethu SHREE SANATAN MANDIR AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 19/12/1970 AS AMENDED ON 22/07/1979 AS AMENDED ON 05/12/1996 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/2003 AS AMENDED ON 21/01/2006 AS AMENDED ON 25/05/2008 as amended on 02 Apr 2017 as amended on 18 Mar 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE TEMPLE AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR HINDU WORSHIP FOR THE INHABITANTS OF LEICESTERSHIRE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS. (B) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LEICESTERSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE, POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINION BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER WITH THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANIZATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, AND TOPROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LEICESTER
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.