GREEN LIGHT - MUSLIM YOUTH FORUM (DUDLEY)
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Bright Sparks Academy - Islamic Supplementary school aimed at 9-11 year-old from the Dudley area. Tutoring Academy - KS2 to KS4 English, Maths and Science. Reverts Circle - Casual get together support group. Mums and Tots. SisterÔÇÖs Tajweed. SisterÔÇÖs Coffee Morning - Monthly get together, discussions about current affairs and books etc. Jumble sale.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 08 January 2017
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Dudley
Llywodraethu
- 06 Gorffennaf 2010: Cofrestrwyd
- 25 Gorffennaf 2018: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- GREEN LIGHT (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 08/01/2013 | 08/01/2014 | 08/01/2015 | 08/01/2016 | 08/01/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £20.87k | £9.92k | £6.06k | £4.07k | £3.58k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £10.95k | £21.65k | £3.60k | £4.96k | £3.05k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 08 Ionawr 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 08 Ionawr 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 08 Ionawr 2017 | 16 Medi 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 08 Ionawr 2017 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 08 Ionawr 2016 | 08 Tachwedd 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 08 Ionawr 2016 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 08 Ionawr 2015 | 25 Hydref 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 08 Ionawr 2015 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 09 JANUARY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 17 MAY 2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN DUDLEY BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF A ADVANCING LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS B ADVANCING EDUCATION C RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT D PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS 2 THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY A EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENCE RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS B PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS
Maes buddion
DUDLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window