Dogfen lywodraethu DUNSVILLE COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31ST MARCH 1967 AS AMENDED 5TH MARCH 1973, 27TH SEPTEMBER 1999 AND 9TH OCTOBER 2002 as amended on 16 Apr 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE GENERAL GOOD OF ALL PERSONS IN THE WARD OF DUNSVILLE IN THE PARISH OF HATFIELD IN THE COUNTY OF YORK IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ELDERLY, BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, FURTHERING HEALTH, RELIEVING POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SICKNESS, OR IN PURSUING ANY OBJECTS WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION))))
Maes buddion
DUNSVILLE IN THE PARISH OF HATFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.