GENDER RIGHTS AND EQUALITY ACTION TRUST

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The GREAT Initiative (The Gender Rights Equality Action Trust) is an advocacy organisation working to drive gender equality worldwide. Our vision is a world in which men and women have an equal chance to thrive.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Pobl

2 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Hawliau Dynol/cytgord Crefyddol Neu Hiliol/cydraddoldeb Neu Amrywiaeth
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Llundain Fwyaf
Llywodraethu
- 23 Medi 2010: Cofrestrwyd
- GREAT (Enw gwaith)
- THE GREAT INITIATIVE (Enw gwaith)
- THE FAS TRUST (Enw blaenorol)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
2 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN RUIMY | Cadeirydd |
|
|
|||||
MARIELLA FROSTRUP | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £1.36k | £690 | £340 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £2.47k | £30.62k | £340 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 29 Awst 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 15 Rhagfyr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 11 Rhagfyr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 28 Rhagfyr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 25 Chwefror 2021 | 25 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 25 MARCH 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 SEPTEMBER 2010 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 OCTOBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 AUG 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
5.HAVING REGARD TO THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS, ADOPTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE UNITED NATIONS ON 10 DECEMBER 1948 [AND THE CONVENTION ON THE ELIMINATION OF ALL FORMS OF DISCRIMINATION AGAINST WOMEN, ADOPTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE UNITED NATIONS ON 18 DECEMBER 1979], THE OBJECTS ARE THE FOLLOWING (PURSUED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT): 5.1 THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY, 5.2 THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS, AND 5.3 THE RELIEF OF CHARITABLE NEED IN EACH CASE WITH SPECIFIC REFERENCE TO GENDER EQUALITY. 5.4 IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE PRIMARY OBJECTS, THE CHARITY MAY 5.4.1 RELIEVE POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY SUPPORTING AND ARRANGING FOR THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, TRAINING, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE AND FACILITIES DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS OF ALL GENDERS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BECOME INCREASINGLY SELF-SUFFICIENT, 5.4.2 PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE INCLUSION OF INDIVIDUALS OF ALL GENDERS IN SOCIAL AND POLITICAL PROCESSES BOTH WITHIN THEIR LOCAL COMMUNITIES AND AT A NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL LEVEL, IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING EQUAL ACCESS TO AND EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES IN POLITICAL AND PUBLIC LIFE FOR INDIVIDUALS OF ALL GENDERS, 5.4.3 PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS, HARMONY AND EQUALITY WITHIN COMMUNITIES, IN PARTICULAR BY PROTECTING AND PROMOTING THE FUNDAMENTAL FREEDOMS OF INDIVIDUALS OF ALL GENDERS IN POLITICAL, ECONOMIC, SOCIAL, CULTURAL, CIVIL OR ANY OTHER FIELD, BY ALL OR ANY CHARITABLE MEANS INCLUDING: RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE, EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS AND GENDER INEQUALITY ISSUES, PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR THE PROTECTION OF THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF INDIVIDUALS OF ALL GENDERS, AND RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND GENDER EQUALITY ISSUES INTERNATIONALLY AND IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, 5.4.4 CO-OPERATE WITH EDUCATIONAL AUTHORITIES AND ORGANISATIONS TO PROCURE THE BETTER UNDERSTANDING AMONG THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF THE ISSUES OF GENDER EQUALITY, 5.4.5 FINANCIALLY SUPPORT PUBLICATIONS AND PROMOTE EXHIBITIONS AND LECTURES AND GENERALLY TO DISSEMINATE INFORMATION ABOUT THE ISSUES OF GENDER EQUALITY AS ARE WITHIN THE SPIRIT OF THE OBJECTS, [AND IN PARTICULAR TO PRINT AND PUBLISH AND DISTRIBUTE SUCH BOOKS, PAMPHLETS AND PERIODICALS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE CALCULATED TO ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THESE ISSUES,] AND 5.4.6 ESTABLISH A HIGH-PROFILE AND INTERNATIONALLY-RECOGNISED AWARDS PROGRAMME DEDICATED TO ACKNOWLEDGING, REWARDING AND PROMOTING INDIVIDUALS, BODIES AND ORGANISATIONS WHO HAVE CONTRIBUTED TO THE SUSTAINED PROMOTION AND MEASURABLE ADVANCEMENT OF THE OBJECTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
Edward Whittaker
GREAT
Office 303
118 Piccadilly
London
W1J 7NW
- Ffôn:
- 02078387180
- E-bost:
- info@thegreatinitiative.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window