Dogfen lywodraethu THE HARROGATE CIVIC SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 501055
Cyfredol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 FEBRUARY 1971 AS AMENDED 10 JUNE 1991, 29 JULY 1998 AND 15 APRIL 1999 as amended on 05 Feb 2015 as amended on 06 Jul 2015 as amended on 13 Mar 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROTECT, PRESERVE AND ENHANCE THE CHARACTER, AMENITIES AND ENVIRONMENT OF HARROGATE AND ITS ENVIRONS BY ANY SUCH MEANS AS ARE DEEMED CHARITABLE
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
HARROGATE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.