PEAK CYCLE LINKS
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Promoting the construction of cycle trails/paths in the High Peak.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2020
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Anabledd
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Hamdden
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Swydd Derby
Llywodraethu
- 17 Tachwedd 2010: Cofrestrwyd
- 13 Hydref 2023: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
Dim enwau eraill
- Buddiannau croes
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £1.61k | £2.06k | £794 | £796 | £752 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £960 | £841 | £969 | £880 | £864 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 13 Hydref 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 23 Hydref 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JULY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 27 OCTOBER 2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) THE PROMOTION OF HEALTHY RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE BY CONSTRUCTING AND MAINTAINING TRAILS IN NORTH-WEST DERBYSHIRE AND THE ADJOINING AREAS FOR RECREATIONAL USE BY THE GENERAL PUBLIC FOR WALKING AND CYCLING AND WHERE POSSIBLE, HORSE RIDING AND USE BY PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES INCLUDING USERS OF MOBILITY SCOOTERS AND WHEELCHAIRS. (2) THE PROMOTION OF THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT BY ACTIVITIES TO ENCOURAGE SUSTAINABLE TRANSPORT.' THESE ARE ITS CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE 2006 ACT. FOR AS LONG AS THE COMPANY IS A CHARITY, ITS PURPOSES MAY ONLY BE ALTERED WITH THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY CONDITIONS ATTACHED TO SUCH CONSENT.
Maes buddion
NORTH-WEST DERBYSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window