Dogfen lywodraethu THE WALTER CARRINGTON EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JUL 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 JAN 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 SEP 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 JAN 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 MAY 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY FURTHERING THE KNOWLEDGE OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF THE ALEXANDER TECHNIQUE BY: (A) TRAINING TEACHERS OF THE ALEXANDER TECHNIQUE IN A MANNER CONSISTENT WITH THE TRAINING PROGRAMME DEVELOPED BY WALTER CARRINGTON AT THE CONSTRUCTIVE TEACHING CENTRE OF HOLLAND PARK, LONDON; AND (B) MAINTAINING AND PROMOTING THE CONSTRUCTIVE TEACHING CENTRE ARCHIVES ON THE ALEXANDER TECHNIQUE; AND (C) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.