THE STACPOOLE TRUST

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Stacpoole Trust holds property at Trott Street Battersea that is used to provide a Roman Catholic Church for the local community. The sale in 2005 of part of the property (the old primary school) provided funds to construct new parish facilities and do some refurbishment to the Church. Work began in Spring 2011 and was completed a year later. This work used up all the charity's funds.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2023
Pobl

3 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Wandsworth
Llywodraethu
- 10 Awst 2010: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
3 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PETER ROBERT BREALEY | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 June 2004 |
|
|
||||
Rev PATRICK ANTHONY SHERLOCK | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 June 2004 |
|
|
||||
Rev KIERAN PATRICK ANDERSON SDB | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 June 2004 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 15 Awst 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 05 Hydref 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 17 Awst 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 28 Medi 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 20 Awst 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 26 JULY 2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
((1) SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF THIS CLAUSE, THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO FURTHER THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK. (2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE USED TO FURTHER THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE BISHOP MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT IT MAY BE USED: (A) AS A SITE FOR, OR OTHERWISE FOR THE PURPOSES OF, A ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH FOR THE PERFORMANCE OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION, IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH REGULATIONS AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE APPROVED BY THE BISHOP; (B) AS A SITE FOR, OR OTHERWISE FOR THE PURPOSES OF, A RESIDENCE FOR THE PRIEST OR ALL OR ANY OF THE PRIESTS BY WHOM THE SAID CHURCH SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE SERVED UNDER THE APPOINTMENT AND WITH THE CONTINUED APPROBATION AND PERMISSION OF THE BISHOP (C) AS A SITE FOR OR OTHERWISE FOR THE PURPOSES OF A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF POOR OR OTHER CHILDREN (EITHER GRATUITOUSLY OR OTHERWISE) AS ROMAN CATHOLICS, WHICH SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS MAY OR MAY NOT INCLUDE A RESIDENCE OR RESIDENCES FOR THE PERSONS OR ANY PERSON ENGAGED IN TEACHING SUCH CHILDREN OR ANY OF THEM AND SHALL BE ATTACHED TO SUCH ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH OR MISSION AND IN ALL RESPECTS BE MANAGED AND CONDUCTED BY SUCH PERSON OR PERSONS AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH SUCH RULES AND REGULATIONS AND UNDER SUCH SUPERVISION AND GENERALLY IN SUCH MANNER AS THE BISHOP SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVE OR DIRECT; AND (D) FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES FOR THE PROMOTION OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION OR EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF ROMAN CATHOLICS AS THE BISHOP SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVE.
Maes buddion
SOUTHWARK
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
SALESIAN PROVINCIAL OFFICE
THORNLEIGH HOUSE
SHARPLES PARK
BOLTON
BL1 6PQ
- Ffôn:
- 01204600720
- E-bost:
- ECONOMER@SALESIANS.ORG.UK
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window