Dogfen lywodraethu LIVERPOOL JOHN MOORES UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/07/2009 AS AMENDED ON 26/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 28/03/2013 AS AMENDED ON 25/07/2013 AS AMENDED ON 21 NOV 2016 as amended on 07 Aug 2018 as amended on 07 Aug 2018 as amended on 10 Nov 2022 as amended on 27 Apr 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT LIVERPOOL JOHN MOORES UNIVERSITY (LJMU) BY: ? REPRESENTING, SUPPORTING AND ADVISING STUDENTS AT LJMU AND PROMOTING THEIR INTERESTS AND WELFARE ? BEING THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN STUDENTS AND LJMU, AND ANY OTHER EXTERNAL BODIES ? PROVIDING SOCIAL, CULTURAL, SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FORUMS FOR DISCUSSIONS AND DEBATE FOR STUDENTS’ PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.