Dogfen lywodraethu ELIM TAMIL MINISTRIES
Rhif yr elusen: 1138592

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12/10/2010 AS AMENDED ON 29/07/2012 as amended on 05 Nov 2018 as amended on 14 Mar 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS (IN THE SCHEDULE TO THE CONSTITUTION) AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES THAT FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.