ACTON COMMUNITY FORUM
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Providing community resource centres Support for residents and voluntary organisations Organising resident events Operating as a key delivery partner in local initiatives and partnerships Working closely with residents and delivering commissioned projects Delivering training Building the capacity of networks, forums and partnerships Serving as a key partner on local decision making bodies
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2018
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Ealing
Llywodraethu
- 01 Chwefror 2011: Cofrestrwyd
- 09 Medi 2013: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
- 01 Hydref 2013: Re-registered
- 03 Mehefin 2021: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
- ACF (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £378.95k | £312.86k | £284.80k | £230.61k | £129.54k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £365.64k | £314.58k | £270.18k | £228.76k | £179.38k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £20.40k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £28.48k | £156.21k | £171.63k | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 31 Ionawr 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 31 Ionawr 2019 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 JANUARY 2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF ACTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA: = TO PROVIDE RELIEF FROM SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE. = TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ITS RESIDENTS OF ALL AGES; AND IN PARTICULAR = TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF ACTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. = TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OR SECTIONS OF THE PUBLIC (INCLUDING INDIVIDUAL COMMUNITIES DEFINED BY THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS IN WHICH THEY LIVE OR WORK OR THEIR ETHNIC ORIGINS) AS THE ORGANISATION SHALL THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window