Dogfen lywodraethu NETWORK FOR ANIMALS CHARITABLE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/08/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE WELFARE AND CONSERVATION OF ANIMALS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY REDUCING COMMERCIAL EXPLOITATION OF ANIMALS, HELPING ANIMALS IN CRISIS AND DISTRESS, WORKING TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO WILD AND DOMESTIC ANIMALS AND TO EDUCATE POLICY MAKERS AND THE PUBLIC IN RESPECT OF THE FOREGOING IN SUCH WAYS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.