BARNET COMMUNITY PROJECTS

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Barnet Community Projects exists to facilitate long term social improvement in the London Borough of Barnet. We do this through residents engagement, empowering them to deliver projects that make a difference to the local community. We deliver youth activities, community cafe, skatepark sessions, reparation projects, mentoring programmes, sports sessions & activities to address disadvantage.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Mae cyfanswm yr incwm yn cynnwys £2,250 o 1 grant(iau) llywodraeth
Pobl

5 Ymddiriedolwyr
25 Gwirfoddolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Nid oes gan unrhyw weithwyr gyfanswm buddion dros £60,000Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Hamdden
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Barnet
Llywodraethu
- 20 Rhagfyr 2010: Cofrestrwyd
- BCP (Enw gwaith)
- Yr Awdurdod Ymddygiad Ariannol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau bwlio ac aflonyddu
- Trin cwynion
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau adrodd am ddigwyddiadau difrifol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cyfryngau cymdeithasol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau treuliau ymddiriedolwyr
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
5 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Benaim | Cadeirydd | 16 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Emma Rachel Not | Ymddiriedolwr | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Anthony Bull | Ymddiriedolwr | 27 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEN MORTON | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
|
|||||
Stephen Pegum | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £81.76k | £96.54k | £112.16k | £106.26k | £111.20k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £85.29k | £84.38k | £106.66k | £107.62k | £115.06k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £1.50k | £7.15k | £5.60k | £3.62k | £2.25k |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 29 Ionawr 2025 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 29 Ionawr 2025 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 09 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 09 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 25 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 30 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 30 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 30 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 27 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 27 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED 11 DECEMBER 2010 as amended on 25 Feb 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITYãS OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE APPLICATION AND USE OF RESOURCES BY NON CHARITABLE BODIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE SET UP OF COMMUNITY PROJECTS, SUPPORTING THEIR ADMINISTRATION AND PROVIDING SUPPORT SERVICES TO THEM; AND BY FACILITATING PARTNERSHIP AND CO-OPERATION IN THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR: (1) "VOLUNTARY SECTOR" MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS; (2) "CHARITIES" ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES; (3) "VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS" ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES; (B) THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) IDENTIFYING NEED IN THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR AND ESTABLISHING PROJECTS OR POLICIES TO ADDRESS THEM; (B) LIASING BETWEEN CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AND OTHER GROUPS OR ORGANISATIONS ON RELEVANT ISSUES THAT AFFECT MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY; (C) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO YOUNG PEOPLE - 'COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING" MEANS DEVELOPING THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. (D) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (E) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, INFORMATION AND ADVICE AND PROMOTING OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY TO DEVELOP NEW SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE; AND (F) TO FURTHER FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY, LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF COMMUNITY MEMBERS. WHERE IN THE VIEW OF THE TRUSTEES IT IS EXPEDIENT IN THE INTERESTS OF THE CHARITY, THE TRUSTEES MAY SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE OVERSEAS PARTNERSHIP PROJECTS WHICH ARE YOUTH AND COMMUNITY FOCUSED IN SUCH COUNTRIES OF THE WORLD AS THEY SEE FIT.
Maes buddion
LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
C/O Rainbow Centre
Dollis Valley Drive
BARNET
Hertfordshire
EN5 2UN
- Ffôn:
- 020 8441 4848
- E-bost:
- accounts@barnetcp.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window