Dogfen lywodraethu Red Horse Vale & District Community First Responders

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 AUGUST 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 20 JANUARY 2011 as amended on 05 Dec 2022 as amended on 25 Jan 2022 as amended on 05 Jun 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINED FIRST RESPONSE VOLUNTEERS, TO ATTEND MEDICAL EMERGENCIES AS DIRECTED BY THE WEST MIDLANDS AMBULANCE SERVICE, OR ITS SUCCESSORS, PRIOR TO THE ARRIVAL OF A RAPID RESPONSE VEHICLE OR AMBULANCE. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN FIRST AID IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF FIRST AID.
Maes buddion
WEST MIDLANDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.