ENFIELD YOUTH ENGAGEMENT PANEL
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
THE CHARITY DELIVERS CONFLICT RESOLUTION/KNIFE/WEAPON/GANG AWARENESS CLASSES TO PRIMARY AND SECONDARY SCHOOLS. IT PROVIDES MENTORS TO YOUNG PEOPLE. IT RUNS A MUSIC PROJECT, WITH BOTH SCHOOLS AND THE ENFIELD SECONDARY TUITION CENTRE FOR EXCLUDED PUPILS, RESULTING IN ACCREDITED AWARDS. THROUGH ITS WEB SITE AND IN PERSON IT PROVIDES ADVICE ON VARIOUS TOPICS, TO ENSURE THE CORRECT CHOICES ARE MADE.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2016
Mae cyfanswm yr incwm yn cynnwys £176,483 o grant(iau) llywodraeth
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Enfield
Llywodraethu
- 19 Ionawr 2011: Cofrestrwyd
- 04 Ebrill 2019: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- YEP (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/07/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £150.31k | £175.97k | £251.16k | £277.71k | £185.79k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £150.31k | £147.40k | £251.73k | £303.33k | £188.18k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £32.91k | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £231.41k | £176.48k |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 02 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 02 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 JULY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 13 JANUARY 2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 AND LIVING IN ENFIELD IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE SUBJECTS AND BENEFITS OF CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND MEDIATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (2) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 AND LIVING IN ENFIELD BY PROVIDING ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND ASSISTANCE AND BY ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES WITH THE AIM OF:- (A) ADVANCING THEM IN LIFE AND HELPING THEM IN PARTICULAR BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) IMPROVING THEIR SKILLS IN CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND MEDIATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; AND BY (D) PROVIDING THEM WITH RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (3) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 LIVING IN ENFIELD BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO THOSE IN NEED OF THEM, AND/OR ACCESS TO CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Maes buddion
ENFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window