Dogfen lywodraethu WELSH WOMEN'S AID
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/01/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13/09/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/12/2013 as amended on 27 Nov 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SUFFERING EXPERIENCED BY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, ANY WOMEN OR HER CHILDREN FROM DIFFERING SOCIAL GROUPS WHO HAVE OR ARE EXPERIENCING DOMESTIC ABUSE AND ALL OTHER FORMS OF 'VIOLENCE AGINST WOMEN', INCLUDING THE WIDER SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC IMPACTS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.