Dogfen lywodraethu BRITISH SOCIETY OF UROGYNAECOLOGY

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/04/2001 AS AMENDED ON 09/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 08/11/2011 as amended on 13 Nov 2020 as amended on 18 Nov 2021 as amended on 22 Nov 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
2. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS OF THE BRITISH SOCIETY OF UROGYNAECOLOGY ARE: 2.1 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 2.1.1 ENCOURAGING THE STUDY AND MANAGEMENT OF FEMALE PELVIC FLOOR DYSFUNCTION INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, URINARY INCONTINENCE, PELVIC ORGAN PROLAPSE AND FAECAL INCONTINENCE; 2.1.2 RAISING AND SETTING STANDARDS OF TRAINING IN UROGYNAECOLOGY INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PROVISION OF A NETWORK OF SUPPORT THROUGH DISCUSSION, STUDY AND COMMUNICATION; 2.1.3 AIDING AN EFFECTIVE CLINICAL NETWORK OF CARE FOR UROGYNAECOLOGY PATIENTS THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND REPUBLIC OF IRELAND; AND 2.1.4 BY PROVIDING A FORUM FOR PRACTITIONERS WITH AN INTEREST IN UROGYNAECOLOGY THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND REPUBLIC OF IRELAND.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM AND THE REPUBLIC OF IRELAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.