THE CHRISTCHURCH EARTHQUAKE APPEAL (UK)
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
On February 22 2011 a 6.3 magnitude struck the city of Christchurch in the Canterbury region in New Zealand causing widespread damage and loss of life. The charity supports fundraising for Christchurch in the United Kingdom and allocates those funds to earthquake recovery initiatives in the region in a number of areas of need including hardship, education, religion, and recreation and leisure.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 April 2014
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Anabledd
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Hamdden
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Llundain Fwyaf
- Seland Newydd
Llywodraethu
- 13 Ebrill 2011: Cofrestrwyd
- 21 Medi 2018: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- CEA UK (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/04/2012 | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £1.15m | £98.57k | £18.16k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £357.20k | £364.99k | £338.37k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o roddion a chymynroddion | £1.13m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o weithgareddau masnachu eraill | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Weithgareddau elusennol | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Gwaddolion | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Buddsoddiad | £9.05k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Arall | £11.73k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Cymynroddion | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ggweithgareddau elusennol | £340.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ar godi arian | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Llywodraethu | £8.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Sefydliad grantiau | £340.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Rheoli buddsoddiadau | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Arall | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Hydref 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Hydref 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Hydref 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Hydref 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2014 | 28 Chwefror 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2014 | 10 Chwefror 2015 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/04/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE THE COMMUNITY OF CHRISTCHURCH AND THE CANTERBURY REGION IN NEW ZEALAND FROM THE ADVERSE EFFECTS OF THE EARTHQUAKES ON 4 SEPTEMBER 2010 AND 22 FEBRUARY 2011 AND ASSOCIATED EVENTS (INCLUDING ANY AFTERSHOCKS OR SUBSEQUENT EARTHQUAKES) BY FURTHERING ANY OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL THINK FIT: (1) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, ILL-HEALTH OR DISABILITY. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY RELIGION THAT IS ACCEPTED AS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. (4) THE PROMOTION OF THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (5) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Maes buddion
CHRISTCHURCH AND THE CANTERBURY REGION IN NEW ZEALAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window