Dogfen lywodraethu SAVERA UK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/07/2015 as amended on 10 Jun 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF INDIVIDUALS AFFECTED BY, AND AT RISK OF, HONOUR-BASED ABUSE AND HARMFUL PRACTICES IN THE UK BY PROVIDING A PROGRAMME OF TRAINING AND INFORMATION TO INDIVIDUALS AND AGENCIES AND CONFERENCES, TO RAISE AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC.
Maes buddion
LOCAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.