Dogfen lywodraethu NEW LONDON EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/05/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/08/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FOUNDATION PROGRAMMES AND WORKSHOPS, ADVICE AND INFORMATION ON EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES AVAILABLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND BY DEVELOPING, ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING LEARNING PARTNERSHIPS BETWEEN EDUCATIONAL ORGANISATIONS, BUSINESSES AND THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING, BY THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT OF AN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS AND, INSOFAR AS IT IS INCIDENTAL OR ANCILLARY TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE, TO CARRY OUT SUCH ACTIVITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION. 3. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.