Dogfen lywodraethu CHRIST CHURCH STUDENTS' UNION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/12/2015 as amended on 22 Oct 2020 as amended on 06 Apr 2021 as amended on 06 Apr 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE UNIONS CHARITABLE OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT CANTERBURY CHRIST CHURCH UNIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 4.1 BEING ACKNOWLEDGED AS THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE BODY FOR ALL STUDENTS ENROLLED ON A RECOGNISED PROGRAMME OF STUDY AT CANTERBURY CHRIST CHURCH UNIVERSITY. 4.2 PROMOTING THE INTERESTS OF STUDENTS AT CANTERBURY CHRIST CHURCH UNIVERSITY DURING THEIR COURSE OF STUDY AND REPRESENTING, SUPPORTING AND ADVISING MEMBERS. 4.3 BEING ACKNOWLEDGED AS THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN THE STUDENTS AND THE UNIVERSITY AND A REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN THE STUDENTS AND ANY OTHER EXTERNAL BODIES. 4.4 PROVIDING SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR MEMBERS. 4.5 PROMOTING CO-OPERATION WITH OTHER UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. 4.6 PROMOTING THE WELFARE AND INDIVIDUAL DEVELOPMENT OF MEMBERS AND PROVIDING ADVICE SERVICES RELATING TO EDUCATIONAL AND WELFARE ISSUES. 4.7 RAISING FUNDS FOR OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.