Dogfen lywodraethu THE HINCKLEY CONCORDIA ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 21/05/1973 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/1996 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2001 AS AMENDED ON 26/10/2009 as amended on 17 Dec 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HINCKLEY AND DISTRICT BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE; (B) TO AND OTHER FACILITIES AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS; (C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS CONSISTENT WITH THE ABOVE OBJECTS IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Maes buddion
HINCKLEY AND DISTRICT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.