Trosolwg o’r elusen THE SAMARITANS OF WAKEFIELD AND DISTRICT
Rhif yr elusen: 219432-36
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
RULES ADOPTED 13/10/1972
AS AMENDED ON 12/11/1992
AS AMENDED ON 21/04/2004
AS AMENDED ON 09/07/2008
AS AMENDED ON 04/11/2010
AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2015
AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN SOUTH CHESHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST SKILLS OR EXPERIENCE, AND
TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS
Maes buddion
WAKEFIELD AND DISTRICT
Hanes cofrestru
- 02 Tachwedd 1972: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill
Dim enwau eraill
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.