HOLLY LANE NURSERY LTD
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We continue to offer flexible affordable childcare to our local and neighbouring communities and employment for up to 20 staff . We offer childcare for 51 weeks of the year.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2020
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Swydd Stafford
Llywodraethu
- 07 Gorffennaf 2011: y derbyniwyd cronfeydd gan 1030436 WESLEY PLAYGROUP (GREAT WYRLEY)
- 05 Gorffennaf 2011: Cofrestrwyd
- 14 Tachwedd 2024: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
- LANDYWOOD NEIGHBOURHOOD NURSERY (Enw blaenorol)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £290.03k | £290.03k | £326.47k | £330.20k | £269.54k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £305.65k | £305.65k | £318.77k | £321.59k | £272.44k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | |||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | |||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | |||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | |||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/10/2013 as amended on 03 Dec 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window